Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 37 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4756 Week
» 15901 Month
» 115686 Year
» 1781062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway 790   02/1901
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) 10869   by 1925
British Railways 50869   11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 1008
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Horwich Works
Order Number 41
Works Number 730
To Service During 02/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/11/1955
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1901
25A   Wakefield on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 06/10/1951
25F   Low Moor 4w/e 31/10/1953
     Withdrawn w/e 05/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   w/e 05/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
06/05/1946 New LMS Districts New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. SLS/194606

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1901 To Service To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 790
Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 730
   
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 10869    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 50869    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (25F)    
05/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 50869    

prev prev