Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4371 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17777 Week
» 70793 Month
» 190320 Year
» 3217173 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
1469 |
|
09/1905 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1923) |
10938 |
|
by 1925 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
1008 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
Order Number |
51 |
Works Number |
919 |
To Service |
During 09/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/10/1946 |
Service Life |
41 yrs, 1 mth , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
09/1905 |
26E |
|
Bacup |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
23D |
|
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/10/1946 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/05/1946 |
New LMS Districts |
New Districts have been formed as follows (as from 6th May, 1946): Bletchley comprising 2B with 2C (Northampton); leaving Rugby with 2A, 2D, 2E, and 2F. The Depot number 2G for Leighton Buzzard has been discontinued. Blackpool comprising 24E with 24F (Fleetwood) Lostock Hall is now in the Accrington District and the Depot No. is now 24C; leaving Bank Hall with 23A to 23D. The Lostock Hall engines which require altered shedplates are 2200/1, 2434-7, 2556, 9502/3, z 9523/4, 9534/5, 9542/9, 9571/98, 9611-7, 9640/9, 10801/69, 10938/41/3, 11345, 11423, 11526, 12160/71, 12244/96, 12317/34/6/99, 12431/60/7, 12522. |
SLS/194606 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1469 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 919 |
|
|
1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 10938 |
|
|
30/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bacup (26E) |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
19/10/1946 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 10938 |
|
|