|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/08/1947 | Horwich Works | On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1910 | To Service | To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 1544 Built at Horwich Works, Works Number 1090 |
||
1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 10898 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Mirfield (25D) | ||
11/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 50898 | ||
04/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) | ||
07/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (25E) | ||
23/02/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 50898 |