|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/01/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works | 1017(89A), 1639, 1650, 3200, 3622, 3631, 3831, 4154, 4270(88A), 4555(83A), 4645, 4663, 4946(89A), 5254(87B), 5658, 5957(81F), 6125, 6137, 6326, 6976/9, 7248, 7329, 7439, 8753(81C), 9612/23/46, 82041, 92227(88A). Works Yard: 2287(89C), D3028, D3979. Waiting Works: 3708(86G), 4179(84A), 4608(81C), 6150(81F), 6972(82B), 6992(85A), 75024(84E). | SLS/196203 |
04/03/1962 | Oxley MPD | Ex-Works on 84B: 4270 (88A), 5254 (87B), 7248 (87D), 7439(87G). | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4249 Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2639 |
||
12/10/1938 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 7248 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Oxley (OXY) | ||
26/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (WOS) | ||
30/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
09/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
13/07/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Duffryn Yard (87B) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
13/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Danygraig (87C) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
15/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (87E) | ||
16/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 7248 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |