Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 27 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 845 Week
» 17796 Month
» 170749 Year
» 1836125 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13246 on 09/11/1933
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2946   21/04/1934
British Railways 42946   31/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 114
To Service Sat 09/11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 20/11/1965 off Oxley (2B)
Service Life 32 yrs , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
12B   (New) on 09/11/1933
12D   Workington w/e 13/07/1935
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 03/07/1937
12D   Workington w/e 02/10/1937
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 16/09/1939
12D   Workington w/e 23/11/1940
5B   Crewe South w/e 24/01/1942
8C   Speke Junction w/e 17/11/1945
8A   Edge Hill w/e 22/06/1946
8C   Speke Junction w/e 20/07/1946
3D   Aston w/e 27/08/1949
5A   Crewe North w/e 20/09/1958
5B   Crewe South w/e 18/04/1959
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/09/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962
2K   Bushbury w/e 11/1964
2B   Oxley w/e 04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 20/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 24/09/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 2K Bushbury 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 2B Oxley 4w/e 08/05/1965
WDN   w/e 20/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13246
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 114
   
21/04/1934 Renumbered Renumbered to 2946    
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
03/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
02/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
16/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
23/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
24/01/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
22/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
20/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
31/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42946    
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
20/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
10/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (2K)    
04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (2B)    
20/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42946 from Oxley (2B)    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev