Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 248 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1949 Week
» 10064 Month
» 137507 Year
» 1802883 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13247 on 02/11/1933
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2947   07/11/1935
British Railways 42947   30/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 115
To Service Sat 02/11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sat 04/12/1965 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 32 yrs, 1 mth , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
12A.1   (New) on 02/11/1933
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 15/06/1935
9B   Stockport Edgeley w/e 22/01/1938
8A   Edge Hill w/e 12/02/1938
5B   Crewe South w/e 10/02/1940
2D   Nuneaton w/e 29/03/1941
5B   Crewe South w/e 15/08/1942
6B   Mold Junction w/e 21/08/1943
5B   Crewe South w/e 15/06/1946
7B   Bangor w/e 28/05/1949
3D   Aston w/e 25/06/1949
3D   Aston 5w/e 16/07/1949
2B   Nuneaton w/e 23/06/1962
5B   Crewe South w/e 29/06/1963
1F   Rugby w/e 11/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 12/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 04/12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 1F Rugby 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 04/12/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/08/1947 Horwich Works On 10/8 the following locos. were under repair: 80, 122, 145, 2704, 2747, 2791, 2947, 2970, 5102, 9505, 9542, 9578, 9604, 9645, 9658, 9667, 10429, 10622, 10639, 10648, 10660, 10720, 10743, 10777 (with 10812's bunker), 10892, 10898, 11253, 11319, 11514, 12037, 12047, 12119, 12159, 12171, 12184, 12196, 12363, 12382, 12581, 12598 and 12870. On the same date Nos. 2722, 2729, 2918, 5340 (with a small 3500 gal. tender) 9529, 10640, 10944, 11486 an 12299 were awaiting repair. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13247
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 115
   
15/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
07/11/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2947    
22/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
12/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
10/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
29/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
15/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
21/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
15/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
30/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42947    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
25/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
04/12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42947 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
02/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev