Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 22 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 840 Week
» 17791 Month
» 170744 Year
» 1836120 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13248 on 10/11/1933
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2948   30/08/1935
British Railways 42948   02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 116
To Service Sat 10/11/1933
Withdrawal Sat 23/10/1965 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
12A   (New) on 10/11/1933
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/07/1935
8A   Edge Hill w/e 26/10/1935
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 28/12/1935
8C   Speke Junction w/e 22/01/1938
4A   Shrewsbury w/e 04/06/1938
8A   Edge Hill w/e 13/08/1938
7B   Bangor w/e 17/08/1940
3D   Aston w/e 25/06/1949
5B   Crewe South w/e 26/09/1953
3D   Aston w/e 31/10/1953
1A   Willesden w/e 05/12/1953
5B   Crewe South w/e 08/12/1956
5D   Stoke w/e 24/11/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/12/1963
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
     Withdrawn on 23/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 25/06/1949
LOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 03/10/1953
EXLOAN 3D Aston 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 1A Willesden 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 01/12/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 23/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/11/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13248
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 116
   
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
30/08/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2948    
26/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
28/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
22/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
04/06/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
13/08/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
17/08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
02/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42948    
25/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
26/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
05/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
08/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
24/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
23/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42948 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
01/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev