17/11/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13251 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 119 Allocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
11/08/1934 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2951 |
|
|
13/07/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
05/10/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
20/06/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
20/04/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A) |
|
|
26/10/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
11/10/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
29/08/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
03/10/1942 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bangor (7B) |
|
|
25/06/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
15/07/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42951 |
|
|
09/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
06/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
01/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
29/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
05/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
26/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42951 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|