Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 36 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4663 Week
» 6401 Month
» 133844 Year
» 1799220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13254 on 06/12/1933
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2954   09/12/1935
British Railways 42954   22/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 122
To Service Sat 06/12/1933
Withdrawal Sat 11/02/1967 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 33 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
10C   (New) on 06/12/1933
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 01/06/1935
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 13/07/1935
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 28/12/1935
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 20/04/1940
7B   Bangor w/e 26/10/1940
6B   Mold Junction w/e 12/06/1943
7B   Bangor (on loan) w/e 02/02/1946
7A   Llandudno Junction w/e 28/06/1947
5B   Crewe South w/e 01/10/1949
3D   Aston w/e 12/11/1949
5A   Crewe North w/e 20/09/1958
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/09/1961
5B   Crewe South w/e 22/06/1963
5E   Nuneaton w/e 02/1964
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 08/1964
     Withdrawn on 11/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 7B Bangor m/e 31/01/1946
LOAN 7B Bangor 5w/e 02/03/1946
EXLOAN 7A Llandudno Junction w/e 28/06/1947
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/09/1961
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 05/09/1964
WDN   w/e 11/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/05/1946 Radlett Sightings 1287 (20F) was seen running light at Radlett, going north, recently. The following strangers were also seen here:-437 (22B) , 486 (21A) , 2954 (7B) , and 562 (20A) . The latter was working a short freight train. SLS/194606
26/04/1964 Swindon Works (A Shop) Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. SLS/196406
20/09/1964 Swindon Works (Outside in works yard) On the occasion of the Society farewell to the last G.W.R. County class tour, the following were on works:- Erecting Shop: D602, D806/19/37/43/9, D1001/6/9/14/15/28/32/43/58, D6335/57, D7009/73, 2210, 6862, 6951, 7803, 7924, 43001/137, 73034 an 92223. New Construction: D9512 complete and painted, D9513-6 almost complete, D9517-24 under construction. Top end of shop, PWM653, D3026/32/190/807/14/24. Weighing shed: D850, D1049, Outside in works yard: 4659, 8405/9, 8732, 9425/27, 42954/78, 43115/20, 60941/45, D1016/24, D6352, D7048, N.C.B. 0-6-2T (ex T.V.R.) and King 6000 (for movement to Stratford). Scrap yard: 2818, 5698, 6010, 6824/7/73, 7929, 8418, 9484, 60809/12/33/6/87, 60916/22/5/32/64/75, 43012/112. Stock shed: D3352, D6826, D9510/11. SLS/196410
11/10/1964 Swindon Works (Turntable area) Erecting shop: D602, D806/15/7/32/7/43/9, D1006/16/24/32/58/60/72, D3025/32/190/807/20/966, D6335/52/6, D7017/46/63, 2210, 6823/7, 6951, 7924/9, 42945/75, 43001/112/20/37, 73034, 92223, D9515/6 Painted, D9517-20 Cabs, D9521-7 Motors, D9528/9 Frames; PWM653; C shop area: NCB 67 (ex-TVR) and 6000 still awaiting movement to Stratford; 2818, 3748, 4626, 5264, 5602, 6010, 6824/73, 8401/18, 9484, 9752, 43003, 60809/12/56/87/916/22/32/41/5, 78009; Outside Erecting shop: 7803, 43012; Turntable area: D830/60, D1010/20, D3437, D7022/7/64, 4659, 8405/9, 9425, 9454, 42954; Stored Stock shed: 1010/2/4, 3702, 4569, 4916, 5963/75, 6804, 73012 SLS/196411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/12/1933 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13254
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 122
   
01/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
09/12/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2954    
28/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
20/04/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
26/10/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Bangor (7B)    
12/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
02/02/1946 Allocation Loaned to Bangor (7B)    
28/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (7A)    
22/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42954    
01/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
20/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
08/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 42954 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
08/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev