Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1470 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19273 Week
» 72289 Month
» 191816 Year
» 3218669 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13255 |
on |
28/12/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2955 |
|
15/04/1935 |
British Railways |
42955 |
|
12/02/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13255 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 123 Allocated to Kentish Town (14B) |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
15/04/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2955 |
|
|
21/09/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
05/03/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
22/01/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
29/04/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
10/02/1940 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/11/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
22/06/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
26/04/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42955 |
|
|
08/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
21/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
16/04/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42955 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
07/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|