Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 803 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14846 Week
» 79800 Month
» 282464 Year
» 3309317 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13263 |
on |
18/12/1933 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2963 |
y/e |
1935 |
British Railways |
42963 |
|
15/10/1949 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1933 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13263 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 131 Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
13/10/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2963 |
|
|
26/09/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
27/03/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
24/09/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abergavenny (4D) |
|
|
08/10/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
26/11/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
17/07/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
02/10/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42963 |
|
|
18/09/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42963 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|