|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/04/1948 | Horwich Works | On 21/4 the following locomotives were in the Erecting Shop: Nos. 133/49, 205, 2701/82/86, 2958, 3841, 4060, 4220, 4307/68, 4497, 4517/48, 5079, 8751/61, 9501/08/20/37, 10630, 10953, 11313/20, 11425, 12089, 12133/71, 12268, 12399, 12411, 12522, 12615 an 12870, while awaiting Works were the following: Nos. 131, 2646, 2796, 2964, 9545, 9607, 10852, 11410, 12152/60, 12397, 12438/67, 12582, 12821/39. Nos. 10429, 10717, 10901, 12247/56, 12422, 12824/37/61 an 12902 were on the scrap road; the boiler of No. 11116 is still there. Nos. R10600 an R10617 are still standing between the Erecting and Paint Shops-the glass having been removed from the coach windows. The only renumbered locomotive seen here with a new cast smoke-box numberplate was No. 45220, the rest not having received them yet. | SLS/194806 |
26/03/1966 | Awaiting Disposal (Stafford) | Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). | SLS/196605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/01/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13264 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 132 Allocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
||
13/10/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) | ||
11/02/1936 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2964 | ||
08/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
27/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
05/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
03/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
02/05/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) | ||
08/05/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42964 | ||
15/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
09/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
19/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
30/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
08/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
14/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
09/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
09/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
22/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
05/10/1963 | Allocation | Loaned to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) | ||
26/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) | ||
11/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
20/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42964 from Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |