Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 251 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1952 Week
» 10067 Month
» 137510 Year
» 1802886 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13268 on 24/01/1934
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2968   20/09/1935
British Railways 42968   18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 136
To Service Sat 24/01/1934
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1A   (New) on 24/01/1934
8A   Edge Hill w/e 20/04/1935
5B   Crewe South w/e 13/07/1935
3D   Aston w/e 14/12/1935
3A   Bescot w/e 21/11/1936
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 12/06/1937
8A   Edge Hill w/e 26/11/1938
1A   Willesden w/e 10/05/1941
2D   Nuneaton w/e 22/11/1941
5B   Crewe South w/e 21/02/1942
5A   Crewe North w/e 03/05/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 10/06/1961
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962
6B   Mold Junction w/e 22/06/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 05/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/1965
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5A Crewe North 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/01/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13268
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 136
   
20/04/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
20/09/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2968    
14/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
21/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
12/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
26/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
10/05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
22/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
21/02/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
18/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42968    
03/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
10/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42968 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    

prev prev