Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 23 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 841 Week
» 17792 Month
» 170745 Year
» 1836121 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13269 on 12/01/1934
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2969   21/08/1935
British Railways 42969   24/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 137
To Service Sat 12/01/1934
Withdrawal Sat 14/11/1964 off Crewe South (5B)
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1A   (New) on 12/01/1934
8B     w/e 20/10/1934
5B   Crewe South w/e 20/04/1935
3D   Aston w/e 30/11/1935
1A   Willesden w/e 14/11/1936
3B   Bushbury w/e 27/03/1937
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 17/02/1940
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962
5B   Crewe South w/e 22/06/1963
1F   Rugby w/e 09/11/1963
5B   Crewe South w/e 11/1964
     Withdrawn on 14/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 1F Rugby 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 14/11/1964
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 05/12/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/03/1961 Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D3925, 40146, 42723/79, 42890, 43880, 44126, 44455, 44512/44, 48118/64, 48507, 48608, 48742/56, 51229, 51441/96, 52270, 52415. Scrap Yard: 50746, 52201/44, 52355. Erecting Shop: D3932-6, D4011/2, 12004/5/46, 42822/4/67/70, 42959/69/75/84, 43000/19, 44099, 44113/97, 44446, 44595, 48056, 48113, 48332, 48454, 48513, 48640/76, 48708, 76077/83, Car Shop: uM28306/81M, uM28586M. Paint Shop: 13247, uM28330M, and the usual preserved engines; Works Shunters: 11304/5/24/68, 47402, 51429. SLS/196105

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/01/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13269
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 137
   
20/10/1934 Allocation      
20/04/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
21/08/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2969    
30/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
14/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
27/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
17/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
24/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42969    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
14/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 42969 from Crewe South (5B)    
03/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev