Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1719 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19522 Week
» 72538 Month
» 192065 Year
» 3218918 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13273 |
on |
20/01/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2973 |
|
11/04/1936 |
British Railways |
42973 |
|
19/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
6P5F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
141 |
To Service |
Sat 20/01/1934 to Willesden (1A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 09/11/1963 off Oxley (2B) |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/01/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13273 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 141 Allocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
08/04/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (28A) |
|
|
09/07/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (27A) |
|
|
15/06/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston (10B) |
|
|
16/11/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2973 |
|
|
21/11/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
20/03/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
12/06/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
28/01/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
29/04/1939 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42973 |
|
|
15/01/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
27/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
20/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42973 from Oxley (2B) |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|