Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13274 on 16/01/1934
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2974   25/02/1936
British Railways 42974   01/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 142
To Service Sat 16/01/1934
Withdrawal Sat 25/09/1965 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 31 yrs, 8 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
1A   (New) on 16/01/1934
28A   Motherwell w/e 08/04/1934
27A   Polmadie w/e 09/07/1934
10B   Preston w/e 13/07/1935
8B   Warrington Dallam w/e 16/11/1935
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/11/1937
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 05/03/1938
2D   Nuneaton w/e 10/05/1941
5B   Crewe South w/e 21/02/1942
8C   Speke Junction w/e 17/11/1945
5B   Crewe South w/e 24/04/1948
2D   Nuneaton w/e 19/06/1948
3D   Aston w/e 17/07/1948
21B   Bescot w/e 23/06/1962
9G   Gorton w/e 12/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
     Withdrawn on 25/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 08/12/1945
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 19/06/1948
ALLOC 3D Aston w/e 17/07/1948
ALLOC 21B Bescot 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 25/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/01/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13274
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 142
   
08/04/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (28A)    
09/07/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (27A)    
13/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
16/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
25/02/1936 Renumbered Renumbered to 2974    
13/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
05/03/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
10/05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
21/02/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
24/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
17/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
01/07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 42974    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
25/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 42974 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
12/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev