Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13277 on 23/01/1934
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2977   12/03/1936
British Railways 42977   16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 145
To Service Sat 23/01/1934 to Crewe South (5B)
Withdrawal Sat 18/06/1966 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 32 yrs, 4 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1966

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
5B   Crewe South (New) on 23/01/1934
26A   Newton Heath by 31/12/1934
7C   Holyhead w/e 25/05/1935
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 01/06/1935
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 01/04/1936
2D   Nuneaton w/e 25/09/1937
5B   Crewe South w/e 05/07/1947
8C   Speke Junction w/e 27/11/1948
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/10/1951
2A   Rugby w/e 03/12/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 21/01/1961
5B   Crewe South w/e 04/03/1961
21C   Bushbury w/e 18/08/1962
5D   Stoke w/e 15/12/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 14/12/1963
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
     Withdrawn on 18/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 5B Crewe South w/e 05/07/1947
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 03/12/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 5w/e 04/02/1961
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 01/09/1962
ALLOC 5D Stoke 4w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 12/06/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 18/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/01/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13277
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 145
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
31/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
25/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Holyhead (7C)    
01/06/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
12/03/1936 Renumbered Renumbered to 2977    
01/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
25/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
05/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
16/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 42977    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
03/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
21/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
04/03/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
18/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke (5D)    
14/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
18/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42977 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
09/1966 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev