|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
15/04/1962 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: 42789, 48670, LYR 1008, D4127, uM65437, uM77158, uM28580, u28930, u29154, u29241, u29653, u29830 M. Light Repair Shop: 44061, D2388. Test House: 47550, 11305. Yard: 43017, 44334, 47402/29, 48684, 11324/68, uM28331, u29560, u29881 M. Erecting Shop: 42708/32, 42828, 42979, 43960, 44074, 44266, 44364/79, 44468, 44554, 48123/38/61, 48295, 48403, 48715 Wren, 12001/9/19/36/49/63/71, D4128-30 (Engines and body sides), D4131/2 (Engines on frames), D4133/4 (frames only). Outside Erecting Shop: 42896, 42959, 44003, 48257, 48321, D117. Car Shop: uM28221, u28497, u28690, u29022, u29289, u29720/2 M. Scrap Road: NIL. | SLS/196205 |
24/01/1965 | Crewe South MPD (Ex or waiting works) | Ex or waiting works: 42979, 44679/777, 45076/553, 48001/132/94. 70036, 80072/125, 92113/206. | SLS/196503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/02/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13279 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 147 Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
||
19/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Huddersfield Hillhouse (25B) | ||
03/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B) | ||
25/05/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
25/07/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2979 | ||
09/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
13/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) | ||
05/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
12/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
08/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
04/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
04/12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42979 | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Longsight (9A) | ||
13/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
26/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
31/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (3D) | ||
18/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) | ||
17/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) | ||
22/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
26/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
23/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (21B) | ||
05/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42979 from Bescot (21B) | ||
05/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |