Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) 13281 on 12/02/1934
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) 2981   27/05/1935
British Railways 42981   06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 6P5F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number 149
To Service Sat 12/02/1934 to Newton Heath (26A)
Withdrawal Sat 21/05/1966 off Heaton Mersey (9F)
Service Life 32 yrs, 3 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Cohens (Ickles)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
26A   Newton Heath (New) on 12/02/1934
5B   Crewe South w/e 12/05/1934
3D   Aston w/e 06/06/1936
1A   Willesden w/e 14/11/1936
3B   Bushbury w/e 27/03/1937
3D   Aston w/e 02/07/1937
3A   Bescot w/e 25/09/1937
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 02/07/1938
8A   Edge Hill w/e 05/11/1938
2D   Nuneaton w/e 29/03/1941
BHD   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 05/03/1949
6B   Mold Junction w/e 22/11/1958
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 18/06/1960
2B   Nuneaton w/e 16/06/1962
5B   Crewe South w/e 22/06/1963
1F   Rugby w/e 09/11/1963
9G   Gorton w/e 12/1964
9F   Heaton Mersey w/e 05/1965
     Withdrawn on 21/05/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 4w/e 29/11/1958
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 5w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 1F Rugby 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 9G Gorton 5w/e 09/01/1965
ALLOC 9F Heaton Mersey 5w/e 12/06/1965
WDN   w/e 21/05/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/02/1934 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13281
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 149
Allocated to Newton Heath (26A)
   
12/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
27/05/1935 Renumbered Renumbered to 2981    
06/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
14/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
27/03/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
02/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
25/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
02/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
05/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
29/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D)    
05/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD)    
06/08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 42981    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (1F)    
12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (9G)    
05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F)    
21/05/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 42981 from Heaton Mersey (9F)    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Ickles    

prev prev