Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 955 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14361 Week
» 67377 Month
» 186904 Year
» 3213757 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1st) |
13281 |
on |
12/02/1934 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway (1934) |
2981 |
|
27/05/1935 |
British Railways |
42981 |
|
06/08/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/02/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13281 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 149 Allocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
12/05/1934 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
27/05/1935 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2981 |
|
|
06/06/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
14/11/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
27/03/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bushbury (3B) |
|
|
02/07/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (3D) |
|
|
25/09/1937 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
02/07/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
05/11/1938 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
29/03/1941 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2D) |
|
|
05/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) |
|
|
06/08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 42981 |
|
|
22/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
16/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
22/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
09/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
21/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 42981 from Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |
|
|