|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1961 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. | SLS/196201 |
26/03/1966 | Awaiting Disposal (Stafford) | Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). | SLS/196605 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/02/1934 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 13282 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number 150 Allocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
||
12/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
19/01/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
16/04/1935 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2982 | ||
20/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
07/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bescot (3A) | ||
25/04/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E) | ||
11/07/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (3C) | ||
02/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (BHD) | ||
03/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) | ||
04/12/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) | ||
05/07/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) | ||
23/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 42982 | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
04/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) | ||
02/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
18/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aston (21D) | ||
04/02/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) | ||
10/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) | ||
1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alsager (5E) | ||
12/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (9G) | ||
05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
13/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 42982 from Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |