Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2752 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16158 Week
» 69174 Month
» 188701 Year
» 3215554 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
3006 |
on |
14/02/1948 |
British Railways |
43006 |
w/e |
11/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 14/02/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 02/03/1968 |
Service Life |
20 yrs , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1948 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 3006 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
20/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
11/11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 43006 |
|
|
19/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12F) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
02/03/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43006 |
|
|
05/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |
|
|