Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 35 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4662 Week
» 6400 Month
» 133843 Year
» 1799219 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 43011 on 25/03/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service Sat 25/03/1948
Withdrawal Sat 11/02/1967
Service Life 18 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 25/03/1948
21A   Saltley w/e 10/12/1949
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 24/03/1951
2B   Nuneaton 4w/e 26/01/1952
11D   Tebay 4w/e 18/05/1957
12B   Carlisle Upperby w/e 09/07/1960
12A   Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 22/06/1963
10A   Carnforth w/e 24/10/1964
12D   Workington w/e 25/09/1965
     Withdrawn on 11/02/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 17A Derby w/e 27/03/1948
LOAN STR Stratford on 17/06/1948
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region w/e 19/06/1948
EXLOAN 17A Derby w/e 24/07/1948
LOAN 21A Saltley w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 21A Saltley w/e 10/12/1949
LOAN 2B Nuneaton w/e 17/03/1951
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 26/01/1952
LOAN 11D Tebay 4w/e 18/05/1957
ALLOC 11D Tebay 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 12B Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 30/07/1960
ALLOC 12C Carlisle Canal 4w/e 03/11/1962
ALLOC 12A Carlisle Kingmoor 5w/e 06/07/1963
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 12D Workington 4w/e 09/10/1965
WDN   w/e 11/02/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 43011
Built at Horwich Works
   
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (21A)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tebay (11D)    
09/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B)    
22/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
25/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
11/02/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 43011    
08/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev