Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 781 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14187 Week
» 67203 Month
» 186730 Year
» 3213583 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43013 |
on |
17/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 17/04/1948 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 16/10/1965 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 5 mths , 29 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/10/1948 |
Bristol Barrow Road MPD |
On 24/10 the following were under repair at this shed-Nos. 1878 (17B), 3551 (3A), 4096 (22C), 4215 (16A) and 45660 (22A). Visiting locomotives included-Nos. 3287 (18A), 3930 (17B), M4010 (21A), 4775 (20A), 48187 (18A), 8424 (21A) and 8763. Both the new Class '4' 2-6-0's (Nos. 43012/13) were absent, one at Saltley 'unbalanced' and the other on a ballast working. 2-6-2T No. 29 (22A) still retains condensing apparatus. |
SLS/194812 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/04/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43013 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (22C) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
14/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43013 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|