Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 3471 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16877 Week
» 69893 Month
» 189420 Year
» 3216273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43024 |
on |
21/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 21/01/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 27/05/1967 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/06/1967 |
Crewe South MPD (condemned or waiting Works) |
Stored-LNER 4498, 44843, 45042, 45243/64/98, 45353/91, 45494; condemned or waiting Works-43024/34, 44666/85, 44737/79, 44800/12/4/60/5, 45006/33, 45197, 45446, 47566, 48011/449/502/548/705, 71000, 78036, 92032. |
SLS/196708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/01/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43024 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
30/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
27/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43024 |
|
|
10/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|