Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 800 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19711 Week
» 84665 Month
» 287329 Year
» 3314182 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43025 |
on |
28/01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Sat 28/01/1949 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 18/09/1965 |
Service Life |
16 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/01/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43025 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
02/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (10E) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12C) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43025 |
|
|
01/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|