Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1184 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14590 Week
» 67606 Month
» 187133 Year
» 3213986 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43030 |
on |
25/03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
Mon 25/03/1949 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1966 |
Service Life |
17 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
25/03/1949 |
52B |
|
Heaton |
5w/e |
16/02/1952 |
52B |
|
Heaton |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
55F |
|
Manningham |
5w/e |
20/07/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
11/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/03/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43030 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton (52B) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43030 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|