Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43064 |
on |
17/11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 17/11/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 20/06/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/08/1953 |
Eastern Region Miscellany |
Ex-L.M.S. type 2-6-0 No. 43064 passed New Barnet on a down goods on Saturday, 22nd August, not a common class on this section as yet. The 1 p.m. (SO) Royston train ex King's X was frequently worked by class K1 2-6-0's from March last summer; among those noted were 62054 on 15/8 and 62055 on 22/8. |
SLS/195402 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/11/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43064 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Spital Bridge (35C) |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
08/01/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
31/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
20/06/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43064 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|