Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1221 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19024 Week
» 72040 Month
» 191567 Year
» 3218420 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43069 |
on |
31/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 31/12/1950 to New England (35A) |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/09/1966 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43069 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
14/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
21/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43069 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|