Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 898 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18701 Week
» 71717 Month
» 191244 Year
» 3218097 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43095 |
on |
23/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
Sat 23/12/1950 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/11/1966 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 11 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1963 |
Lincoln MPD |
The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. |
SLS/196310 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/12/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43095 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
12/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
10/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
26/11/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43095 |
|
|
04/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|