Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1747 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19550 Week
» 72566 Month
» 192093 Year
» 3218946 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43097 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
During 01/1951 to Selby (50C) |
Withdrawal |
Tue 03/01/1967 |
Service Life |
16 yrs , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
50C |
Selby |
on |
24/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
53E |
Goole |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
5w/e |
11/08/1962 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
10/09/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
03/01/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43097 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Selby (50C) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
10/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
03/01/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43097 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|