Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2070 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15476 Week
» 68492 Month
» 188019 Year
» 3214872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43108 |
on |
25/05/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Sun 25/05/1951 to South Lynn (31D) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 14/11/1965 |
Service Life |
14 yrs, 5 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 04/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/05/1951 |
Doncaster Works |
New Construction on 27/5/51 consisted of Class 4MT 2-6-0's. Those built, under Order 394 have motion stamped for locos. of Order 391 which follows: e.g. Nos. 43109-11 (Order 394, Nos. 3-5) have motion stamped 43139-41, which are Nos. 3-5 of Order 391. Those present were Nos. 43108 (shed), 43109 (paint shop), 43110/1 (frames, cyls. and boiler mounted), 43137/8 (frames and cyls. set up), and 43139/40 (frames set up). Electric No. E26014 was in paint shop, and No. E26012 in Mexborough repair shop. |
SLS/195107 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/05/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43108 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to South Lynn (31D) |
|
|
07/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
11/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
13/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Canklow (41D) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
09/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
14/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43108 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|