Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 311 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18114 Week
» 71130 Month
» 190657 Year
» 3217510 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43118 |
on |
21/06/1951 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/06/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43118 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
28/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
06/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12D) |
|
|
18/11/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43118 from Workington (12D) |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|