|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/01/1960 | St. Albans Closure | St. Albans (14C) closed after dieselisation of St. Pancras-Bedford service on 11th January, 43119, 47261/554/642, 42134/680/6 being transferred to Cricklewood and 40026 to Bedford. | SLS/196003 |
18/01/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard Sidings) | Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. | SLS/196402 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43119 Built at Horwich Works Allocated to Nottingham (16A) |
||
08/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Albans (14C) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) | ||
22/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
30/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kettering (15B) | ||
17/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
13/02/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H) | ||
19/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
26/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tebay (12E) | ||
31/12/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) | ||
24/06/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) | ||
12/08/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43119 |