Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 314 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6241 Week
» 4979 Month
» 419300 Year
» 1640865 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 43126 on 05/12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 4MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service Tue 05/12/1951 to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
Withdrawal Tue 05/04/1966
Scrapping During 07/1966
Service Life 14 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) on 05/12/1951
52C Blaydon 4w/e 20/06/1953
52B Heaton 5w/e 23/07/1955
56B Ardsley 5w/e 20/07/1957
56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 21/09/1957
52B Heaton w/e 25/07/1959
52A Gateshead w/e 18/06/1960
52G Sunderland w/e 17/09/1960
52B Heaton w/e 11/02/1961
52A Gateshead w/e 03/06/1961
52F Blyth (North) w/e 26/08/1961
50A York (North) w/e 16/09/1961
   Withdrawn on 05/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52CAlSTON   4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 52C Blaydon 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 3w/e 02/07/1960
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 52B Heaton 4w/e 04/03/1961
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 03/06/1961
ALLOC 52FS   4w/e 09/09/1961
ALLOC 50A York (North) 3w/e 30/09/1961
WDN   on 05/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/09/1954 Doncaster Works (under repair) Under construction in the new erecting shop on 28/9/54 were 80106 (almost complete) and 80107-110. Engines in the scrap roads included 65002, 65493/95, 68799 an 69482. Ivatt Class 4 2-6-0s under repair were 43016 an 43126. SLS/195411
23/04/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. SLS/196106
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 43126
Built at Horwich Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
20/06/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (52C)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
21/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
25/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
18/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
11/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
03/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
26/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F)    
16/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
05/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 43126    

prev prev