|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/06/1952 | Highland Monikers | Old Highland monikers are re-introduced to 'Caley' types. 'Caley Bennies' to 54440-54508 Class, 'Caley Barneys' and 'Big Caley Barneys' to 57550-692 Class. Ex CR 54440 Class engines go to the Kyle but the drivers do not like them very well because of their 6 ft. 6 in. wheels. Locally 6ft. wheels would be 'chust the chob.' On suggesting an ex NB 'Glen' the reply was 'Poor, Poor, engines.' On 18th May the Sunday service on the Milngavie-Hairilhon trains (ex L.N.E.) was worked by ex L.M. 2-6-0 43132-4, the first time the entire day service has not had ex L.N.E. locos. A week later only ex L.N.E. J37 were on trains. The K1 class are now working passenger trains on the West Highland line. The 'Glen' class (D34) in Glasgow area appear mainly employed on goods work. Three N2 0-6-2T are to be sent to Dawsholm depot for use on ex C. Ry. 'Underground' services. Two are said to have arrived. |
SLS/195208 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1951 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 43132 Built at Horwich Works |
||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (63D) | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
17/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kipps (65E) | ||
24/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) | ||
22/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hurlford (67B) | ||
09/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
11/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
30/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
06/11/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) | ||
01/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 43132 | ||
04/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |