Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2576 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15982 Week
» 68998 Month
» 188525 Year
» 3215378 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
43138 |
on |
20/07/1951 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
4MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
Fri 20/07/1951 to Eastfield (65A) |
Withdrawal |
During 04/1967 |
Service Life |
15 yrs, 8 mths , 11 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
65A |
Eastfield |
on |
23/07/1951 |
ALLOC |
64F |
Bathgate |
4w/e |
17/04/1954 |
ALLOC |
65C |
Parkhead |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
64G |
Hawick |
2w/e |
07/10/1961 |
LOAN |
51F |
West Auckland |
4w/e |
12/10/1963 |
ALLOC |
51F |
West Auckland |
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
91NE |
|
4w/e |
09/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
4w/e |
08/02/1964 |
ALLOC |
50A |
York (North) |
5w/e |
12/09/1964 |
ALLOC |
52FS |
|
4w/e |
13/08/1966 |
ALLOC |
52FN |
|
4w/e |
05/11/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/03/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 43138 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
17/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) |
|
|
30/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hawick (64G) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Auckland (51F) |
|
|
08/02/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
13/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) (S.Blyth to N.Blyth) |
|
|
04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 43138 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale |
|
|