10/09/1951 |
Scottish miscellany |
On 10th September, a new Ivatt 2-6-0, no 43137, was seen at Saughton Junction, hauling a Glasgow-Edinburgh goods. No. 43139has also been seen, both working from 65A. On 3rd September, the Heart of Midlothian left Edinburgh behind 60162 Saint Johnstoun in dark green livery. |
SLS/195111 |
31/08/1952 |
Selby-York |
During the last three Sundays of August the East Coast main line was closed between Selby and York, owing to re-laying work at Escrick, main line trains being diverted via Shaftholm Junction, Askern and Church Fenton. An interesting working on Sunday, 24th August, was the 4.5 p.m. train from Wakefield to York; this arrived at Selby behind 61388 (37A) and left five minutes later for York, via Church Fenton (i.e., in the opposite direction) behind Class 4 2-6-0 43123 (50C). The train was retimed to arrive at York at 5.32 p.m. instead of 5.20 p.m., but due to smart running by 43123 actually arrived at 5.28 p.m. The 8.40 a.m. train from Glasgow to King's Cross on Sundays calls at Selby at 4.30 p.m.; on 24th August, connection from Selby with this train was being maintained by a special shuttle service operated by motor-fitted 'G.5' Class 0-4-4T 67250 (50C) with one of the push-and-pull sets normally used on the Selby-Goole service. It was amusing to watch the incredulous faces of passengers who on asking for 'the London train' were politely directed to 67250's two-coach train in the up bay platform. On the same date (24/8/52) six 'D20' Class 4-4-0s were at Selby shed, i.e., 2395, 62374/81/84/86/92; these D20s at Selby have recently been doing much useful work, mainly between Leeds-Selby-Hull, Selby-York, etc. although the writer of these notes regrets to record a recent Selby-Hull run when 62378 (also of Selby) had difficulty in starting away from Selby and also lost time in running. Although some of the Selby 'D20s' are in good condition (notably 62384/92), D.20/2 No. 62360 (52D) was brought down specially from Alnmouth Junction to work the SLS/MLS special between Cudworth and Hull via the Hull and Barnsley main line on 24th August. D.20s 62343/45 at York are working on Harrogate trains and also on the 5.55 p.m. train from York to Pickering via Gilling and Helmsley. The 6.30 p.m. from York to Harrogate is a Selby duty and Selby D.20s are used on occasions although more often this train is worked by one of the Selby Class 4 L.M.R. pattern 2-6-0s. An unusual visitor to York, on 21st August, was Class 4 2-6-0 43139 (68E) en route to Doncaster Works; in an adjacent shed road at the same time was A3 Class Pacific 60068 Sir Visto (also 68E) returning from Doncaster Works to Carlisle. |
SLS/195211 |
09/07/1961 |
Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) |
Paint Shop: uM28360M, uM28673M, 48341. Car Shop: uM28311, uM28387M, uM28584M. Works Yard: 12032, 40075/7, 42721/4, 42941/60/2, 44477, 49637, 52182: Moss Side: D4025, 42747, 42839/71/95, 43045, 43920, 44098, 44141, 44242, 47520, 48084, 48268, 48641. Scrap Yard: 51429 intact. Erecting Shop: D4026/7/95-9, 12003, 42774/8/87, 42829/43/97, 43115/39, 44007/60, 44104, 44339, 44432, 44567/82, 48060, 48155, 48200/9/50, 48329/70, 48464/72, 48501, 48615/98, 48740, Wren. Works Shunters: 11304/24/68, 47402/29. |
SLS/196108 |
17/03/1963 |
Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) |
Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. |
SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 |
Coventry (Stored) |
On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. |
SLS/196304 |