Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 579 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3505 Week
» 5243 Month
» 132686 Year
» 1798062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6402 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 46402 w/e 11/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 12/1946
Withdrawal During 06/1967
Service Life 20 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1968

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1946
15B   Kettering on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
15C   Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/12/1956
17A   Derby w/e 10/01/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/05/1964
8K   Bank Hall w/e 03/07/1965
9L   Buxton (LNWR) w/e 13/11/1965
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 15B Kettering w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 8K Bank Hall 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 9L Buxton (LNWR) 4w/e 04/12/1965
WDN   w/e 01/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/11/1964 Crewe Works (Near Chester line) Erecting shop: D1641-1662; D214, D224, D236, D257, D351, D395/7, D5700/14, D6833/49, D8014/26/35/59, 42581, 42665, 44689, 44710/74, 45215/79, 46484, 48056, 48190, 48301, 48533/56, 48719/40, 92008/74/9/87/8; Near Chester line: 44715, 44844, 44988, 45000, 45660, 46402, 92019; Side of Works: 42089, 42218, 42569, 44658, 44778, 44838, 44989, 45035, 45303, 45412, 45562, 46501, 48168, 48612, 92004/64, 92117/67. Paint shop area: D251, D297, D305, D329, D336, D369, D1633/4/5/7/8/9/40, D5716, D6889, D8058, 42233, 48046/50, 70002/11/34, 92233; Cutting up: 42221, 42559; New Erecting shop: D338, E3002/4, 26025; Inspection road: 44667, 45031, 48206/52, 92139/57; Misc.: 42267/97, 44730, 45089, 45130, 48153/92, 48212/67, 48345/65, 48455, 48529, 48677/85, 48764, 70015/18/37, 80072, 92206, D219, D293, D6774, D8001/36, 26049. SLS/196412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1946 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6402
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kettering (15B)    
11/02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 46402    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (8K)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46402    
01/1968 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev