Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 411 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5398 Week
» 13513 Month
» 140956 Year
» 1806332 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London, Midland & Scottish Railway 6412 m/e 01/1947
British Railways 46412 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 01/1947
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1966
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1947
24E   Blackpool Central on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 28/11/1953
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/10/1954
26D   Bury w/e 15/09/1962
9D   Newton Heath w/e 10/04/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 26D Bury 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 2w/e 10/04/1965
WDN   w/e 06/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1947 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6412
Built at Crewe Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Blackpool Central (24E)    
30/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 46412    
28/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46412    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev