Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 369 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18172 Week
» 71188 Month
» 190715 Year
» 3217568 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
6419 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways |
46419 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
During 03/1947 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 6 mths , 3 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/06/1948 |
Bank Top MPD |
Ex L.M.S. Nos. 6418/19 arrived at Bank Top shed W/E 12/6/48. No. 6418 is at present working from West Auckland and No. 6419 from Darlington over the summit to Kirkby Stephen on tests. |
SLS/194808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 6419 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46419 |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
22/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46419 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|