Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 34 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 6399 Month
» 133842 Year
» 1799218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46422 on 13/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 13/11/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/12/1966
Service Life 18 yrs, 1 mth , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 13/11/1948
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 27/02/1954
8D   Widnes 4w/e 27/03/1954
6K   Rhyl 8w/e 19/06/1954
8D   Widnes 4w/e 09/10/1954
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 19/05/1956
12D   Kirkby Stephen w/e 09/04/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 17/06/1961
24J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 10/02/1962
10A   Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 24/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 8D Widnes w/e 13/11/1948
LOAN 5A Crewe North 4w/e 20/03/1954
EXLOAN 8D Widnes 4w/e 20/03/1954
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 12D Kirkby Stephen 5w/e 30/04/1960
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 01/07/1961
ALLOC 24J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 24/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/07/1960 Barnard Castle-Kirkby Stephen-Penrith and Tebay Goods traffic (except for local pick-up Kirkby Stephen-Penrith) ceased after Sat. 2nd July, and the last goods train over the 'top' (i.e. Stainmoor summit) was hauled by 46422 an 46442 which worked from Kirkby Stephen to West Aukland and back. On 21st August only 46449, 46458 an 46470 were left on Kirkby Stephen shed which now has one duty left; in addition a standby engine is needed on Saturdays till the Blackpool trains finish. The diesel service to Penrith will continue in the Winter t.t. as it is understood that B.R. have to establish with the T.U.C.C. that the line is uneconomic now there is no goods traffic, before the line can be wholly closed (except for the Kirkby Stephen-Appleby section). SLS/196009

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/11/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46422
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
09/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby Stephen (12D)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (24J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
24/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46422    
05/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev