Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 313 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2014 Week
» 10129 Month
» 137572 Year
» 1802948 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46423 on 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Sat 27/11/1948 to Widnes (8D)
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/01/1965
Service Life 16 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
8D   Widnes (New) on 27/11/1948
8D   Widnes 8w/e 11/07/1953
6K   Rhyl 4w/e 19/05/1956
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 22/03/1958
2B   Nuneaton w/e 06/12/1958
3D   Aston w/e 31/01/1959
1C   Watford w/e 15/09/1962
8D   Widnes w/e 25/05/1963
8C   Speke Junction w/e 18/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 16/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 8D Widnes w/e 27/11/1948
LOAN 6K Rhyl 4w/e 13/06/1953
EXLOAN 8D Widnes 4w/e 11/07/1953
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 12C Workington 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 3D Aston 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 1C Watford 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   w/e 16/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46423
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Widnes (8D)
   
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
22/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
06/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B)    
31/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Aston (3D)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Watford (1C)    
25/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
16/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 46423    
05/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev