Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 956 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2030 Week
» 27391 Month
» 260311 Year
» 1925687 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46428 on 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service Wed 04/12/1948 to Preston (10B)
Withdrawal During 12/1966
Service Life 17 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
10B   Preston (New) on 04/12/1948
10B   Preston 4w/e 07/10/1950
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 24/03/1951
10F   Lower Ince w/e 09/06/1951
10F   Lower Ince 4w/e 16/06/1951
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 19/04/1952
6K   Rhyl 8w/e 19/06/1954
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 09/10/1954
21B   Bescot w/e 10/02/1962
21C   Bushbury w/e 24/03/1962
2L   Leamington w/e 24/10/1964
2A   Tyseley w/e 19/06/1965
5B   Crewe South w/e 08/10/1966
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN STP Heaton Mersey w/e 19/03/1949
LOAN 13G Lower Ince w/e 09/07/1949
EXLOAN 10B Preston w/e 23/09/1950
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 24/03/1951
ALLOC 10F Lower Ince w/e 09/06/1951
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/10/1954
ALLOC 21B Bescot on 20/03/1962
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 2L Leamington 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 2A Tyseley 4w/e 10/07/1965
ALLOC 5B Crewe South 4w/e 08/10/1966
WDN   w/e 12/11/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1962 Bescot MPD In addition to 46442/56 ex 12F other 64XX class to arrive are *46428/48 from 8F and 46470 from the N.E.R. (*STOP PRESS-These two were transferred to Bushbury on 20th March.) SLS/196204
07/07/1968 Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. SLS/196810

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/12/1948 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46428
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Preston (10B)
   
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
09/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F)    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Ince (10F)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
24/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (2L)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (2A)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 46428    

prev prev