Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4389 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20001 Week
» 118646 Month
» 321310 Year
» 3348163 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
British Railways |
46432 |
on |
25/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
2MT |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
To Service |
Sat 25/12/1948 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/05/1967 |
Service Life |
18 yrs, 4 mths , 11 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/12/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways Number 46432 Built at Crewe Works |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rhyl (6K) |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Workington (12C) |
|
|
30/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/05/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46432 |
|
|
11/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|