Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 278 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 1979 Week
» 10094 Month
» 137537 Year
» 1802913 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46439 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 01/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/03/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1950
25A   Wakefield w/e 18/02/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 09/10/1954
26D   Bury w/e 15/09/1962
9K   Bolton w/e 10/04/1965
8L   Aintree w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn w/e 18/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 24F Fleetwood w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 30/10/1954
ALLOC 26D Bury 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 9K Bolton 2w/e 10/04/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1965
WDN   w/e 18/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46439
Built at Crewe Works
   
18/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
10/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
18/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46439    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev