Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 23 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4650 Week
» 6388 Month
» 133831 Year
» 1799207 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46440 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 02/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/03/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1950
20A   Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 27/02/1954
17A   Derby 4w/e 24/04/1954
18A   Toton 4w/e 03/11/1956
17A   Derby 4w/e 26/01/1957
18A   Toton 4w/e 23/02/1957
17A   Derby 4w/e 20/04/1957
17B   Burton 4w/e 10/08/1957
17A   Derby w/e 10/01/1959
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 23/05/1964
8C   Speke Junction w/e 07/11/1964
8E   Northwich w/e 18/06/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 25/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 23A Bank Hall w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 20A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 17A Derby 4w/e 17/04/1954
LOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 03/11/1956
EXLOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 26/01/1957
LOAN 18A Toton 4w/e 23/02/1957
EXLOAN 17A Derby 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 17B Burton 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 17A Derby 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 5w/e 06/06/1964
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 4w/e 07/11/1964
ALLOC 8E Northwich 4w/e 09/07/1966
WDN   w/e 25/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46440
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
03/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
10/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
23/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
18/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
25/03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46440    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev