Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 27 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 6392 Month
» 133835 Year
» 1799211 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46448 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 03/1950
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Service Life 17 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1950
12D   Workington w/e 27/05/1950
12D   Workington 2w/e 17/06/1950
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 27/02/1954
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 19/06/1954
5F   Uttoxeter w/e 16/01/1960
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/03/1960
21B   Bescot w/e 10/02/1962
21C   Bushbury w/e 24/03/1962
2E   Saltley w/e 07/12/1963
9D   Newton Heath w/e 15/10/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 12D Workington w/e 27/05/1950
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 12/06/1954
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 12/06/1954
LOAN 5F Uttoxeter 4w/e 30/01/1960
EXLOAN 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 21B Bescot on 20/03/1962
ALLOC 21C Bushbury 4w/e 31/03/1962
ALLOC 2E Saltley 4w/e 07/12/1963
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 5w/e 12/11/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1962 Bescot MPD In addition to 46442/56 ex 12F other 64XX class to arrive are *46428/48 from 8F and 46470 from the N.E.R. (*STOP PRESS-These two were transferred to Bushbury on 20th March.) SLS/196204
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Yard) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46448
Built at Crewe Works
   
27/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
17/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Uttoxeter (5F)    
12/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
10/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (21B)    
24/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (21C)    
07/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Saltley (2E)    
15/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46448    
10/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev