Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46459 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service During 05/1950
Withdrawal During 09/1965
Service Life 15 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1950
2A   Rugby 4w/e 09/09/1950
5A   Crewe North 4w/e 07/10/1950
12C   Durran Hill (Carlisle) m/e 30/11/1950
12C   Durran Hill (Carlisle) 4w/e 02/12/1950
12D   Workington 4w/e 27/02/1954
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 19/05/1956
10A   Springs Branch (Wigan) m/e 16/06/1956
6A   Chester (MR) 4w/e 11/08/1956
3A   Bescot 4w/e 06/10/1956
2A   Rugby w/e 18/05/1963
5E   Nuneaton w/e 05/12/1964
     Withdrawn m/e 09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 5A Crewe North w/e 27/05/1950
LOAN 2A Rugby w/e 19/08/1950
EXLOAN 5A Crewe North w/e 23/09/1950
ALLOC 12C Durran Hill (Carlisle) m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 12D Workington 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 19/05/1956
LOAN 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 16/06/1956
EXLOAN 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 14/07/1956
ALLOC 3A Bescot 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 01/06/1963
ALLOC 5E Nuneaton 4w/e 05/12/1964
WDN   w/e 02/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1950 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46459
Built at Crewe Works
   
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
07/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe North (5A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Durran Hill (Carlisle) (12C)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A)    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (3A)    
18/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
05/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E)    
09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 46459    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev