Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 326 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2027 Week
» 10142 Month
» 137585 Year
» 1802961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 46486 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class 2MT
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Works Number 2178
To Service During 11/1951
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/05/1967
Service Life 15 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 09/1967

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1951
28A   Blackpool Central 4w/e 26/01/1952
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 27/02/1954
26E   Lees (Oldham) w/e 09/06/1962
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/04/1964
10J   Lancaster Green Ayre w/e 14/08/1965
10A   Carnforth w/e 23/04/1966
     Withdrawn w/e 06/05/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW 26A Newton Heath w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 28A Blackpool Central 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 20/02/1954
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 30/06/1962
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 10J Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 11/09/1965
ALLOC 10A Carnforth 4w/e 07/05/1966
WDN   w/e 06/05/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/04/1963 Crewe Works (Paint Shop and Outside) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1064-73 (in various stages of construction), D1550 body built (Brush 2750 H.P. D.E.)- New Construction. D210/17, D305/10/16/30/36/43/73, D8003/14/18, 44675/89, 44756, 44810/28, 45410, 45531, 46515/22, 48404/44, 48526, 48680, 70016/23/46, 82042, 92035, 92127/46/52/53 92207/39. Outside Erecting Shop: 45322, 70035, 80136, For Butlin's Camp, Pwllheli 46100, For Butlin's Camp, Skegness 46203. Yard: 42182, 42426/69, 42592, 44877, 45067, 45126, 45481, 46106/08/23/27, 47380, 82036, 92104/201. Paint Shop and Outside: D1062/3, D57, D214, 44710, 44869, 45002/26/33/42, 45481, 46486, 48660, 92044/97/155 78002. Scrap Road: 46124/34/35. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1951 To Service To service as British Railways Number 46486
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2178
   
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Blackpool Central (28A)    
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
09/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (10J)    
23/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
06/05/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 46486    
09/1967 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev